Global Patent Index - EP 0825275 B1

EP 0825275 B1 2001-01-31 - Process for coating nickel or cobalt-base superalloy substrate

Title (en)

Process for coating nickel or cobalt-base superalloy substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Substrates aus einer Superlegierung auf Nickel- oder Kobaltbasis

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un apport sur une pièce en superalliage base de nickel ou de cobalt

Publication

EP 0825275 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401953 A

Priority

FR 9610351 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825275A1] A substrate of nickel or cobalt-based alloy (2) is coated with another alloy at least over a restricted area by applying a powdered mixture of metals (1) which is then caused to react by controlled heating in a vessel filled with inert gas at up to 1.5 GPa pressure. The vessel has elements able to heat it to 1200 degrees C at 5-120 degrees C/minute to create a thermal gradient of 200 degrees C between opposite ends of the area, so that the reaction begins at one end of the mixture and is rapidly propagated therethrough, forming an intermetallic compound which bonds itself to the substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 10/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/23 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); B22F 7/06 (2006.01); C22C 19/05 (2006.01); C23C 10/28 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/064 (2013.01); C23C 10/28 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 7/064 + B22F 3/23 + B22F 3/15

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825275 A1 19980225; EP 0825275 B1 20010131; CA 2207827 A1 19980222; CA 2207827 C 20040615; DE 69704010 D1 20010308; DE 69704010 T2 20010621; FR 2752540 A1 19980227; FR 2752540 B1 19981204; JP 4036925 B2 20080123; JP H10237507 A 19980908; US 5954895 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160820

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160820

2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-05-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160821

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160820

2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-03-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704010

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SNECMA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNECMA SERVICES, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69704010

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704010

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704010

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704010

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704010

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

2012-05-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120419 AND 20120425

2010-01-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704010 20010308

2001-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL SE

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA SERVICES

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990831

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IE NL SE

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL SE

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970901

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL SE