Global Patent Index - EP 0825316 A3

EP 0825316 A3 2001-05-16 - Method and system for writing an information key

Title (en)

Method and system for writing an information key

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Einschreiben einer Schlüsselinformation

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour inscrire une information de clé

Publication

EP 0825316 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97202546 A

Priority

DE 19633802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825316A2] The method is used for key information transmitted from a central point to a remote point for recording on a data carrier, to allow replacement of a lost access key. Object information is transmitted from the remote point to the central point for read-out of the stored key information, which is encoded before transmission using a code which is stored at the central point and at the key and which must be used for decoding the received key information before it can be recorded on the data carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/08 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00857 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); G07C 2009/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825316 A2 19980225; EP 0825316 A3 20010516; EP 0825316 B1 20040728; EP 0825316 B2 20080206; DE 19633802 A1 19980226; JP 4065347 B2 20080326; JP H10107789 A 19980424; US 2001040966 A1 20011115; US 6337912 B2 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170818

2017-09-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170818

2017-08-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59711801

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-12-04 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59711801

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-10-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59711801

2008-10-03 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-04-09 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-02-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-29 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711801 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUHR, WOLFGANG

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOERNER, HELMUT

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7G 07C 9/00 B

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG GMBH

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE