Global Patent Index - EP 0825317 B1

EP 0825317 B1 2000-07-26 - Bolt fitting for window, door or similar, with two wings

Title (en)

Bolt fitting for window, door or similar, with two wings

Title (de)

Riegelbeschlag für Fenster, Türen od. dgl. mit zwei Flügeln

Title (fr)

Ferrure avec tige de verrouillage pour fenêtre, porte ou similaire, à deux vantaux

Publication

EP 0825317 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113947 A

Priority

DE 29614649 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825317A1] The leaves of the door or window have hollow profile metal or plastics members with undercut grooves for driving rods etc. One leaf is stationary and the other opens, the two being contained in a fixed frame without centre-post. The stationary leaf can hinge, while the opening one hinges and can also tilt. When shut, the stationary leaf is locked by top and bottom sliding bolts in its upright member and which engage with horizontal members of the fixed frame. Each bolt is accommodated in a groove and actuated by a protruding handle (8). The latter is detachably coupled via plug-in-type connectors (28,29) to the bolt or driving rod (9) and slides on a fixing component (7). This is secured by the undercuts (14) in the groove (6a) of the hollow profiled member (3a) so that it cannot slide, typically be means of a fixed hooked foot (19), opposite to which is an adjustable clamping screw (20). The handle can have a sideways-facing window-type opening (21) for engagement by the fixing component, and whose guide width matches that of the fixing component. Its length matches the amt. of movement of the bolt or rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 1/04; E05B 3/00; E05C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2013.01); E05B 3/00 (2013.01); E05B 15/1635 (2013.01); E05C 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614649 U1 19961002; EP 0825317 A1 19980225; EP 0825317 B1 20000726; ES 2150725 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110814

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100810

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150725 T3

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702075 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980311

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI