Global Patent Index - EP 0825333 B1

EP 0825333 B1 2001-05-23 - Coolable turbine blade

Title (en)

Coolable turbine blade

Title (de)

Kühlbare Turbinenschaufel

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine pouvant être refroidie

Publication

EP 0825333 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810561 A

Priority

DE 19634237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825333A1] The blade comprises a foot (11) and a vane (1) with pressure side wall and suction side wall connected together at the front and rear edge areas to forming a hollow cavity (2) for passing through the coolant. A radially aligned diverging cooling channel (7) is provided in the rear edge area (4) and is connected to the cavity through an inlet opening (9) and through connecting channels (8). The cooling channel is normally mounted in the downstream part of the blade taken from the middle. Cooling fluid flows through the cavity and inlet opening and channels to the cooling channel to stimulate flow circulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F02C 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/201 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825333 A1 19980225; EP 0825333 B1 20010523; CN 1105228 C 20030409; CN 1177676 A 19980401; CZ 9702679 A3 19980318; DE 19634237 A1 19980226; JP 4152458 B2 20080917; JP H1089007 A 19980407; US 5934874 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA IP UK LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20171221

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170807

2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-08-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170807

2017-08-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703585

2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20161110

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59703585

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703585

- Representative's name: ROESLER PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 59703585

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 59703585

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703585

- Representative's name: ROESLER PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703585

- Representative's name: ROESLER PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2004-07-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-11-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2003-11-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-02-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703585 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990528

1998-11-11 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970812

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT