Global Patent Index - EP 0825335 B1

EP 0825335 B1 2002-09-18 - Spray nozzle for piston cooling of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Spray nozzle for piston cooling of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Spritzdüse für die Kolbenkühlung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Gicleur de refroidissement de piston d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0825335 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110179 A

Priority

DE 19633167 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825335A1] The system has at least two almost parallel outlet channels (19,20), the spacing (a) of which is less than twice the diameter of the larger channel. The diameter (d) of the outlet channels is between 0.8 mm to 1.5 mm, and approximately 1.2 mm, and the spacing of the channels about 1.5 mm. The diameter of the channels may be the same. On their inlet ends (21,22) the outlet channels are opened out in conical fashion, with a cone angle of about 45 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/08; B05B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/08 (2006.01); B05B 1/14 (2006.01); F01P 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/08 (2013.01); B05B 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633167 A1 19980219; EP 0825335 A1 19980225; EP 0825335 B1 20020918; JP H1077833 A 19980324; US 5915345 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708245

- Effective date: 20120103

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070621

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708245 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT