Global Patent Index - EP 0825381 B1

EP 0825381 B1 2002-09-18 - Housing for lamp socket in light fixture housings

Title (en)

Housing for lamp socket in light fixture housings

Title (de)

Anbaugehäuse für eine Lampenfassung in Leuchtengehäusen

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour douille de lampe dans des boîtiers de luminaire

Publication

EP 0825381 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111135 A

Priority

DE 29614194 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825381A1] The annexed housing (13) is made of an insulating material and is dish-shaped, has a base, side walls and an opening directed into the luminaire interior. The edges of the opening have associated locking means for locking the dish shaped housing to a section of the light body wall with the base of the housing (13) directed outwards relative to the light body wall. The lamp socket (31) is arranged to be fitted into the housing (13). The base has an opening into which locking elements (17) arranged on the back wall of the socket are inserted. The housing (13) has a window type wall opening (34) arranged in a wall. A lamp socket (13) fits through this opening (34) in the transverse and longitudinal direction. The openings pass in the base for inserting the socket side locking elements into guide slits (36) directed towards the wall opening (34) for a transverse laying of the locking elements (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2015.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/0872 (2013.01); F21V 19/008 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614194 U1 19961024; AT 224519 T 20021015; EP 0825381 A1 19980225; EP 0825381 B1 20020918; ES 2183052 T3 20030316

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708246

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150703

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130704

2014-08-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130703

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100704

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708246

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OSTRIGA, SONNET, WIRTHS & VORWE, DE

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183052 T3

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708246 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224519 T 20021015

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BJB GMBH & CO. KG

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971217

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE