Global Patent Index - EP 0825408 A3

EP 0825408 A3 2000-06-07 - Portable device preventing unauthorized use of an article

Title (en)

Portable device preventing unauthorized use of an article

Title (de)

Handliche transportable Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung einer unbefugten Handhabung eines Gegenstands

Title (fr)

Dispositif empêchant l'utilisation non-autorisée d'un article

Publication

EP 0825408 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97810565 A

Priority

CH 206696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825408A2] The device (1) is attached to a protected object by a clamp which is released after entering a correct authorisation code. The code is entered via an input device (10) coupled to an electronic evaluation circuit. The entered code is compared with stored data held in a memory, to provide an operating signal for the electromechanical drive used to release the clamp. An audible alarm may be provided upon input of an incorrect code or response of a movement detector incorporated in the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/00; E05B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01); F41A 17/54 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2013.01); F41A 17/54 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 49/00 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825408 A2 19980225; EP 0825408 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE