Global Patent Index - EP 0825573 B1

EP 0825573 B1 2001-12-19 - Method and device for signal evaluation of a movement detector

Title (en)

Method and device for signal evaluation of a movement detector

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auswertung eines Signals eines Bewegungsmelders

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'analyse d'un signal d'un capteur de mouvements

Publication

EP 0825573 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113304 A

Priority

EP 96113304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825573A1] The method involves evaluating a detected signal change based on the steepness of the produced signal curve. An area of the steepness is pref. associated with a movement sequence, and a voltage rise is pref. associated with the signal, which lies within the determined steepness. A difference between a momentary steepness value and a steepness limit is pref. used as first criterion, an excess of a minimal signal rise from an actual voltage rise is pref. used as second criterion, and the actual change is evaluated, using a microprocessor, as a detected movement only if both criteria are met.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/191

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19 (2006.01); G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/24 (2013.01); G08B 13/19 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • DE 2103909 A1 19710819 - OPTICAL COARING LAB INC
  • Heinen B.: 'Intrusionsschutz für gewerbliche Risiken', ESSERs Präsentation bei der EAB, Berlin-DDR, 07.02.1990
  • Heinen B.: 'Analoge Prozessmeldetechnik für höchste Sicherheit im Gebäude- und Objektschutz', VDI-Berichte Nr. 896, 1981, S. 319 - 338
  • "AlgoRex - Das neue interaktive Brandmeldesystem mit AlgoLogic", in Cerberus-Alarm, Nr. 116/1994
  • Luck H.: '10. Internationale Konferenz über automatische Brandentdeckung AUBE 95', Proceedings, Verlag Mainz, Aachen, 1995.
  • Schmidhäusler F.: 'Brandfrüherkennung: Verfahren, Techniken, Alternativen', Verlag Moderne Industrie, Landsberg, 1994.
  • Fuhrmann H.: 'Gefahrenmeldesysteme', Hüthig Buchverlag, Heidelberg, 1992

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825573 A1 19980225; EP 0825573 B1 20011219; EP 0825573 B2 20050323; DE 59608506 D1 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2011-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111125

2009-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-03-31 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-11-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-03-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2004-07-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NOVAR GMBH

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ESSER EFFEFF ALARM GMBH

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608506 20020131

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI