Global Patent Index - EP 0825624 B1

EP 0825624 B1 2001-04-11 - Method of winding in layers filamentary material and apparatus

Title (en)

Method of winding in layers filamentary material and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum lagenweisen Aufwickeln von strangförmigem Wickelgut sowie Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le bobinage en couches de matériaux filamenteux et dispositif

Publication

EP 0825624 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114456 A

Priority

DE 19634231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825624A2] The method involves winding the strand-type material (1) onto a rotatable spool (4) with lateral movement between the material feed (2) and spool. Parts of the material are wound onto parts of a previously wound intermediate material (15). The speed of axial displacement of the intermediate material is greater than that of the primary material. The lateral displacement of the winding material per layer takes place in one direction and that of the intermediate material takes place partly in the same direction and partly in the opposite direction. The sum of the displacements in the two directions is an integer greater than or equal to 3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/06; B21C 47/00; B65H 54/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/10 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 55/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/122 (2013.01); B65H 54/28 (2013.01); B65H 54/2803 (2013.01); B65H 55/04 (2013.01); H01F 41/061 (2016.01); H01F 41/064 (2016.01); B65H 2701/37 (2013.01); B65H 2701/3914 (2013.01); B65H 2701/3916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825624 A2 19980225; EP 0825624 A3 19980513; EP 0825624 B1 20010411; DE 19736387 A1 19980305; DE 19736387 C2 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020821

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010801

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010801

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703341 20010517

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH & CO. KG

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970902

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI