Global Patent Index - EP 0825669 A3

EP 0825669 A3 2000-02-23 - Mobile communication apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile communication apparatus

Title (de)

Mobiles Funkgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif mobile de communication

Publication

EP 0825669 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97114591 A

Priority

JP 22209096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825669A2] A portable telephone (10) includes a portable telephone body (14) made from plastic having a receiver (11), a transmitter (12) and dial keys (13), and a chip antenna (17) which is mounted on a circuit board (15) secured at the inside of the portable telephone body (14) and which is electrically connected to an RF section (16) provided on the circuit board (15) in the portable telephone (10). The chip antenna (17) is disposed near the transmitter (12) where a transmitted electric wave is unlikely to receive the effects of a person who is holding the portable telephone (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/38; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 1/24 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825669 A2 19980225; EP 0825669 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041213

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970910

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB