Global Patent Index - EP 0825677 A3

EP 0825677 A3 2000-05-10 - Reflector material with low passive intermodulation (PIM)

Title (en)

Reflector material with low passive intermodulation (PIM)

Title (de)

Reflektormaterial mit niedriger passiver Intermodulation (PIM)

Title (fr)

Matériau réflechissant à intermodulation passive basse (PIM)

Publication

EP 0825677 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97113410 A

Priority

US 69710996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825677A2] A mesh material (10) for a spacecraft antenna (20) reflector is disclosed. The mesh material has a base material made from a dielectric fabric. A conductive material, such as nikkel, is applied to the dielectric mesh. The type and thickness of the conductive material is adjusted to regulate the final conductivity of the reflective surface to a predefined range. The mesh material (10) utilizes a range that reduces PIM while at the same time maintains a high degree of RF reflectivity. The preferred range is 0.01 to 10 ohms per square. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/16; H01Q 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/28 (2006.01); H01Q 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/168 (2013.01); H01Q 1/288 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/263 (2013.01); Y10T 428/264 (2013.01); Y10T 428/265 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31681 (2015.04); Y10T 442/109 (2015.04); Y10T 442/178 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5411795 A 19950502 - SILVERMAN BERNARD [US]
  • [A] FR 2689091 A1 19931001 - EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]
  • [A] DE 4024488 A1 19910207 - ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] WADE W D: "DEVELOPMENT OF LOW PIM, ZERO CTE MESH FOR DEPLOYABLE COMMUNICATIONS ANTENNAS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (MILCOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. -, 1990, pages 1175 - 1178, XP000221690

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825677 A2 19980225; EP 0825677 A3 20000510; EP 0825677 B1 20041229; CA 2210229 A1 19980219; CA 2210229 C 20000627; DE 69732067 D1 20050203; DE 69732067 T2 20051208; US 5885906 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732067 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB