Global Patent Index - EP 0825688 A3

EP 0825688 A3 2000-03-22 - Electronic ballast for rail mounted lamps

Title (en)

Electronic ballast for rail mounted lamps

Title (de)

Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät für Tragschienenleuchten

Title (fr)

Ballast électronique pour lampes sur rail de support

Publication

EP 0825688 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97111284 A

Priority

DE 29614406 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825688A2] A suspended electrical lighting system has a fluorescent light tube (4) that has plug on connectors at each end (6) that are offered up to sockets (12,14) that are located in holes (35) in a carrier panel (3). Mounted on the upper surface of the carrier is an electronic starter circuit module (5) that is preassembled. This has an integral adapter stage (11) that has connecting pins that engage contact bushes (30) within a socket (9) that is fixed to a mounting rail (2) secured to the ceiling. Extensions (15) have embedded power conductors that connect with the sockets in the carrier panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H05B 41/00 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); H01R 13/6633 (2013.01); H05B 41/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); H01R 9/2491 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614406 U1 19961017; AT 221263 T 20020815; DK 0825688 T3 20021028; EP 0825688 A2 19980225; EP 0825688 A3 20000322; EP 0825688 B1 20020724; ES 2177863 T3 20021216; PT 825688 E 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040705

2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040704

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2004-07-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2004-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: VOSSLOH SCHWABE GMBH#GARTENSTRASSE 14#D-58511 LUEDENSCHEID (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#GARTENSTRASSE 14#58511 LUEDENSCHEID (DE)

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-09 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030703

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177863 T3

2002-12-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403384

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-10-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59707775 20020829

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221263 T 20020815

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE