Global Patent Index - EP 0825897 A4

EP 0825897 A4 2000-04-26 - POLYMER-SUPPORTED CATALYST FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (en)

POLYMER-SUPPORTED CATALYST FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (de)

KATALYSATOR AUF POLYMERTRÄGER ZUR OLEFIN-POLYMERISATION

Title (fr)

CATALYSEUR A SUPPORT POLYMERE POUR LA POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES

Publication

EP 0825897 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96911489 A

Priority

  • US 9604356 W
  • US 41267995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630122A1] The present invention is directed to a novel supported Ziegler-Natta catalyst useful for the polymerization of alpha -olefins. More specifically, the supported Ziegler-Natta catalyst of the present invention comprises a particulate functionalized copolymeric support, an organometallic compound and a transition metal compound. A novel method of preparing the particulate functionalized copolymeric supports of the instant invention is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 103/19; B01J 103/24; C08F 4/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/12 (2006.01); C08F 4/44 (2006.01); C08F 4/64 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 10/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/027

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630122 A1 19961003; CA 2215829 A1 19961003; EP 0825897 A1 19980304; EP 0825897 A4 20000426; JP H11507086 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08F 4/02 A, 7B 01J 31/06 B, 7C 08F 4/44 B, 7C 08F 10/00 B

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EQUISTAR CHEMICALS, LP.

1998-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIMAIO, ANTHONY-J.

1998-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEVERDEN, CRAIG, C.

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970929

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE