Global Patent Index - EP 0825947 B1

EP 0825947 B1 2001-05-16 - SPRAYHOOD FITTED ON A LIFE JACKET

Title (en)

SPRAYHOOD FITTED ON A LIFE JACKET

Title (de)

AN EINER RETTUNGSWESTE MONTIERTER SPRITZWASSERSCHIRM

Title (fr)

CAPUCHON DE PROTECTION POUR APPAREIL DE SAUVETAGE

Publication

EP 0825947 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96906865 A

Priority

  • GB 9600617 W
  • GB 9505504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629241A1] A sprayhood adapted to be attached to and worn with a life preserver such as a life jacket (37) or buoyancy aid by a person floatin g in water. The sprayhood comprises sheet material including a clear panel (10, 38) having support means (19, 47, 48, 50, 55) to hold the material well clear of the wearer's face and vent means (20, 60, 61) to allow an adequate supply of air to circulate arround the wearer's head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/125

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/125 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/1255 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629241 A1 19960926; AU 5011796 A 19961008; AU 710021 B2 19990909; CA 2214719 A1 19960926; DE 69612847 D1 20010621; EP 0825947 A1 19980304; EP 0825947 B1 20010516; GB 9505504 D0 19950503; NO 974218 A 19970912; NO 974218 D0 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100318

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100318

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612847 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990323

1998-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARDLE STOREYS (SAFETY & SURVIVAL EQUIPMENT) LIMIT

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970903

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE