Global Patent Index - EP 0825954 B1

EP 0825954 B1 2000-03-22 - FOLDABLE, FOURSIDED FRAMEWORK

Title (en)

FOLDABLE, FOURSIDED FRAMEWORK

Title (de)

FALTBARES, VIERSEITIGES GESTELL

Title (fr)

OSSATURE A QUATRE COTES, PLIANTE

Publication

EP 0825954 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96914518 A

Priority

  • SE 9600632 W
  • SE 9501863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9636541A1] A foldable, foursided frame, particularly intended for use as a side-wall member in a case (1), as a loading-pallet collar or the like, has two confronting long side walls (2, 3) and two confronting short side walls (4, 5), said long and short walls being hingedly interconnected at the frame corners by means of corner joining members (6-9), such as flexible joining strips. One (2) of the long side walls consists of two juxtaposed wall parts (2', 2"), one (2') of which is hingedly connected to one (4) of the short side walls by means of one (6) of the corner joining members, whereas the other wall part (2") is hingedly connected to the opposite short side wall (5) by means of another one (9) of the corner joining members, said wall parts being hingedly interconnected by means of a supplementary joining member (10), such as a flexible joining strip. Said one (2') wall part has a width equalling that of said one (4) of the short side walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/18; B65D 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/16 (2013.01); B65D 9/14 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00169 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00273 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00323 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00497 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00502 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00601 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00641 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00661 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0091 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00915 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

No further relevant documents have been disclosed.

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9636541 A1 19961121; AU 5785796 A 19961129; DE 69607342 D1 20000427; DE 69607342 T2 20000921; EP 0825954 A1 19980304; EP 0825954 B1 20000322; SE 503665 C2 19960729; SE 9501863 D0 19950519; SE 9501863 L 19960729

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040515

2003-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030521

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030507

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607342 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971118

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB IT NL