Global patent index - EP 0826099 B1

EP 0826099 B1 2000-07-19 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CYLINDER PHASE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION MULTICYLINDER FOUR STROKE ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CYLINDER PHASE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION MULTICYLINDER FOUR STROKE ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUN DER PHASE DER ZYLINDER EINER MEHRZYLINDER-VIERTAKTBRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE DE LA PHASE DES CYLINDRES D'UN MOTEUR MULTICYLINDRES A COMBUSTION INTERNE A CYCLE A QUATRE TEMPS

Publication

EP 0826099 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96916198 A

Priority

  • FR 9600725 W
  • FR 9505711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9636803A1] In an engine (M) with an ignition (1, 2, 3, 4) and/or injection system wherein each cylinder is individually controlled, and with a sensor (7) co-operating with a rotary target (8) having an indexing element (10) indicating a reference cylinder upper dead centre position, a method comprises the steps of generating, on the reference cylinder, a disturbance other than the interruption of the injection, and of a type capable of causing a change in the engine torque, detecting the engine torque change by a change in a signal representative of the gas torque, caused by the generation of the disturbance, establishing a relationship between the time of generation and the detection of its result on the engine torque so as to derive the reference cylinder phase at the time of generation of the disturbance, and thereafter the phase of the other engine cylinders. The invention is particularly useful for four stroke engines with sequential ignition and/or injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06; F02D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02P 7/077 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02P 7/0775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9636803 A1 19961121; DE 69609416 D1 20000824; DE 69609416 T2 20010301; DE 69633642 D1 20041118; DE 69633642 T2 20060202; EP 0826099 A1 19980304; EP 0826099 B1 20000719; EP 0987421 A2 20000322; EP 0987421 A3 20020828; EP 0987421 B1 20041013; ES 2230791 T3 20050501; FR 2734322 A1 19961122; FR 2734322 B1 19970725; US 5970784 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609416

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100513

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090505

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-10-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609416

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000719

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990317

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971114

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE