Global Patent Index - EP 0826102 B1

EP 0826102 B1 2000-01-26 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE DRIVE UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE DRIVE UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT EINES FAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITE MOTRICE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0826102 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945152 A

Priority

  • DE 9601898 W
  • DE 19609242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609242A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for controlling a vehicle drive unit. According to said method the control functions for the power of the drive unit and the monitoring of said control functions are carried out by a single microcomputer. A monitoring module separated from the microcomputer is provided to check the monitoring functions and send test signals to the microcomputer at a given time. Said microcomputer subsequently calculates the monitoring function of interest on the basis of test data. The result of the calculation is transmitted to the monitoring module which checks the operation capacity of the function monitoring system in the microcomputer by comparing it with stored values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/107 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609242 A1 19970911; DE 59604306 D1 20000302; EP 0826102 A1 19980304; EP 0826102 B1 20000126; JP 3955328 B2 20070808; JP H11505587 A 19990521; KR 100412755 B1 20040428; US 6125322 A 20000926; WO 9733083 A1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161001

2016-10-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604306

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604306 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990323

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE