Global Patent Index - EP 0826199 B1

EP 0826199 B1 2003-06-18 - ELECTRIC AIR IONISATION SMOKE DETECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC AIR IONISATION SMOKE DETECTOR

Title (de)

RAUCHMELDER MIT ELEKTRISCHER LUFTIONISIERUNG

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE FUMEE A IONISATION D'AIR PAR VOIE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0826199 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97914374 A

Priority

  • FR 9700434 W
  • FR 9603296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2746184A1] An air ionisation smoke detector including a detection chamber (1) with an anode (2) and a cathode (3) interconnected via a bias circuit (16) having a current strength measurement device (18), as well as an ionisation chamber (6) communicating with the detection chamber. Ions are electrically generated in the ionisation chamber then transferred into the detection chamber by means of a continuous stream of air with a low flow-rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/113

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/113 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735287 A1 19970925; DE 69722871 D1 20030724; DE 69722871 T2 20040513; EP 0826199 A1 19980304; EP 0826199 B1 20030618; ES 2202599 T3 20040401; FR 2746184 A1 19970919; FR 2746184 B1 19980605

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170313

2017-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170626

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170311

2017-04-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170311

2017-03-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722871

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202599 T3

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722871 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINSECUR

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORWIN

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEWINER, JACQUES

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMYCZ, EUGENE

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971118

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT DE ES GB IT