Global patent index - EP 0826320 A3

EP 0826320 A3 2000-01-19 - Method for heat treatment of hair and device for using same

Title (en)

Method for heat treatment of hair and device for using same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Wärmebehandlung von Kopfhaar sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Verwendung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement thermique des cheveux et dispositif d'utilisation du procédé

Publication

EP 0826320 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114680 A

Priority

DE 19635213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826320A2] Process and device for manual selection of operation temperature for a heating device (hair dryer) for hair such as might be used during perming or colouring of hair. If a lower operating temperature is selected the corresponding heating time is extended. The device comprises a temperature alteration device (2) for lowering of the operating temperature for use either by the customer or hair dresser with three registers (R1-R3) and corresponding register stores (IR1-IR3) so that according to one of three temperatures a counter (C) in a time cycle (ti) circuit is added too, so that the pre-set time value (Wmax) is still reached and the heating process finished. A display is provided to show the remaining heating time. An alternative provides for continuous variation of the temperature selection and therefore heating time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 7/06; A45D 19/00; A45D 20/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 7/06 (2006.01); A45D 20/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/30 (2013.01); A45D 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826320 A2 19980304; EP 0826320 A3 20000119; EP 0826320 B1 20020123

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-12-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20040511

2004-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-08-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WELLA A.G.

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OLYMP KARL HERZOG GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020825

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59706163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020314

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2002-01-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 45D 7/06 A, 7A 45D 20/30 B, 7A 45D 19/00 B

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970825

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL