Global Patent Index - EP 0826324 A3

EP 0826324 A3 2001-05-02 - Harness arrangement for carrying a hand-held work machine

Title (en)

Harness arrangement for carrying a hand-held work machine

Title (de)

Gurtanordnung zum Tragen eines handgeführten Arbeitsgerätes

Title (fr)

Agencement de harnais pour porter un instrument de travail actionné à la main

Publication

EP 0826324 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97113804 A

Priority

DE 19634670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826324A2] Shoulder-straps (31,32) with free front ends (33) are fixed to a back-plate (21) from the side of which leads a forward running side belt (40) whose front end (42) ends at the bottom of the user's (2) thorax. The side support plate (19) for the implement is joined by a support-band (17) to the back-plate and to the side belt. A pelvis-belt (50) open towards the support plate is under the side strap and is fixed to the base (21b) of the back plate near its back end (51). The belt's front end (52) lies under the side belt's end and is joined to the support plate's band. The free front ends of the shoulder-straps are spaced apart from each other and from the front end of the pelvis strap and from the front end of the side belt and are joined by side connecting straps (35) to the base of the back plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/68 (2006.01); A45F 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/14 (2013.01); Y10S 224/907 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826324 A2 19980304; EP 0826324 A3 20010502; EP 0826324 B1 20021204; CN 1108742 C 20030521; CN 1176046 A 19980318; DE 19634670 A1 19980305; DE 19634670 C2 19981203; ES 2187708 T3 20030616; JP 2889555 B2 19990510; JP H1098930 A 19980421; US 5913464 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170810

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-08-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708867

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187708 T3

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708867 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010414

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDREAS STIHL AG & CO.

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE