Global Patent Index - EP 0826331 A3

EP 0826331 A3 2000-12-13 - Basket machine

Title (en)

Basket machine

Title (de)

Maschine für Warenhauskörbe

Title (fr)

Machine pour paniers de magasin

Publication

EP 0826331 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97202610 A

Priority

SE 9603079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826331A2] The object of the present invention is an automatic machine for receiving, storing and handing out of shopping baskets. In the machine there takes place a control of received baskets concerning their kind and condition. The machine is also intended to make possible the taking of a deposit for the use of a basket. When a basket is input to the basket machine it is conveyed into the box 15 at a position which is marked by the basket 1. In this position there is an identification or control of the basket by electronic or mechanical means. The accepted basket is brought upwards to the position which in the figure is marked by the basket 2, where it is gripped by toothed wheels 13, 14. In another embodiment of the invention the input and handing out of baskets is from the top of the storage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 10/04; G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826331 A2 19980304; EP 0826331 A3 20001213; SE 518202 C2 20020910; SE 9603079 D0 19960826; SE 9603079 L 19980227

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 10/04 A, 7G 07F 7/06 B

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI