Global Patent Index - EP 0826355 B1

EP 0826355 B1 2001-03-21 - A foldable wheelchair

Title (en)

A foldable wheelchair

Title (de)

Faltbarer Rollstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant pliable

Publication

EP 0826355 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96810563 A

Priority

EP 96810563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826355A1] A wheelchair is made up of a pair of parallel main frames connected to each other on the rear side via a detachable back supporter and on the front side via footplates foldable along a center hinge extending in the longitudinal direction. Large wheels and a seat plate are detachably coupled to the main frames. The seat plate is changeable in level by leverage operation. After detachment of the large wheels, and unlocking of the back supporter, the wheelchair can approach very close to a user lying on a bed. When the large wheels are detached, the wheelchair can go through doors of ordinary sizes. By folding the foot plates together, the main frames can be put together side by side for convenience in transportation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/08; A61G 5/10; A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/08 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/053 (2013.01); A61G 5/08 (2013.01); A61G 5/0816 (2016.11); A61G 5/0883 (2016.11); A61G 5/0891 (2016.11); A61G 5/1054 (2016.11); A61G 5/1059 (2013.01); A61G 7/1015 (2013.01); A61G 5/1002 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826355 A1 19980304; EP 0826355 B1 20010321; DE 69612192 D1 20010426; DE 69612192 T2 20011011

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-09-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010826

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010826

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612192 20010426

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

2001-03-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIZUNO, JIRO

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990825

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIZUNO, JIRO

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980814

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE