Global Patent Index - EP 0826433 A3

EP 0826433 A3 2000-05-24 - Process and apparatus for coating the inside of a gas bottle

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for coating the inside of a gas bottle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Innenbeschichtung einer Gasflasche

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour revêtir l'intérieur d'une bouteille de gaz

Publication

EP 0826433 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97890171 A

Priority

AT 50396 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826433A2] The coating process comprises warming the bottle (1), dropping thermoplastic plastic powder into it, turning the bottle by its inner wall about its longitudinal axis (21) and angling it to varying extents to an axis (16) running across the longitudinal axis. The powder melts and formed a coating. A carrier (7) can turn on a mounting, carrying a clamping device (8) for the gas bottle, which can also turn. The carrier has an angling drive (14) and the clamping device (8) has a rotary drive (39).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/22; B05D 1/00; B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/22 (2006.01); F17C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/227 (2013.01); B05D 1/002 (2013.01); F17C 1/10 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0114 (2013.01); F17C 2201/054 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0619 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0639 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0646 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2205/018 (2013.01); F17C 2209/227 (2013.01); F17C 2209/232 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2260/013 (2013.01); F17C 2260/053 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0745 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826433 A2 19980304; EP 0826433 A3 20000524; EP 0826433 B1 20040317; AT 1592 U1 19970825; DE 59711407 D1 20040422

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711407 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05D 7/22 A, 7B 05D 7/14 B, 7B 05D 1/00 B

1998-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOS. HEISER VORMALS J. WINTER'S SOHN AKTIENGESELLS

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT