Global Patent Index - EP 0826444 B1

EP 0826444 B1 2000-09-20 - Light-metal blank for use in insert-casting of another light-metal object and method for preparing the surface of the blank

Title (en)

Light-metal blank for use in insert-casting of another light-metal object and method for preparing the surface of the blank

Title (de)

In ein Leichtmetall-Gussteil einzugiessender Rohling aus Leichtmetall und Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung eines solchen Rohlings

Title (fr)

Ebauche en métal léger utilisé comme pièce d'insertion dans un autre objet en métal léger et procédé de traitement de surface de cette ébauche

Publication

EP 0826444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112343 A

Priority

DE 19634504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19634504A1] The blank (9) of a light-metal component to be incorporated into a light-metal casting comprises a) an outer surface (10) with a roughness above 20 mu m; b) the topography of the surface is formed by thrown out pointed structures roughly resembling pyramids or lancets; c) at the base the structures directly go over into the main structure of the blank. Also claimed is a method for producing such a blank.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/10 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 19/08 (2006.01); B24C 3/32 (2006.01); B24C 11/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2013.01); B22D 19/00 (2013.01); B22D 19/0081 (2013.01); B24C 3/32 (2013.01); B24C 11/00 (2013.01); F02F 1/004 (2013.01); F02F 2001/104 (2013.01); F02F 2007/009 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12229 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12444 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12451 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12472 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12764 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19634504 A1 19971204; BR 9704502 A 19981208; CN 1083741 C 20020501; CN 1180598 A 19980506; EP 0826444 A1 19980304; EP 0826444 B1 20000920; ES 2152061 T3 20010116; JP 3054816 B2 20000619; JP H1094867 A 19980414; KR 100256706 B1 20000515; US 6074763 A 20000613; US 6286583 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110718

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110718

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152061 T3

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702377 20001026

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990210

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE