Global Patent Index - EP 0826450 B1

EP 0826450 B1 2001-02-28 - Process for forming to final size of a recess

Title (en)

Process for forming to final size of a recess

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kalibrierung einer vorgeformten Ausnehmung

Title (fr)

Procédé de calibration d'un évidement

Publication

EP 0826450 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114049 A

Priority

DE 19635183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826450A1] The method concerns calibration of a basically disk-shaped sintered component (1) whose circumferential surface has a continuous and/or polygonal contour provided with at least one annular recess. The component is placed into a calibrating die (12) and is fixed by at least one top and one bottom profiled punches (18, 17) and by at least one calibrating slider (20.1, 20.2) meshing with the recess. Pressure is applied to the punches. As a result, the recess is brought to the final dimensions by at least particle deformation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 5/10; B22F 3/03; F16F 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/03 (2006.01); B22F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/03 (2013.01); B22F 5/10 (2013.01); B22F 2003/166 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49252 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49265 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49861 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49945 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826450 A1 19980304; EP 0826450 B1 20010228; DE 19635183 A1 19980305; ES 2155643 T3 20010516; US 6101713 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703037

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703037

- Representative's name: KNH PATENTANWAELTE KAHLHOEFER NEUMANN ROESSLER, DE

2015-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703037

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2015-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703037

- Representative's name: KNH PATENTANWAELTE KAHLHOEFER NEUMANN ROESSLER, DE

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100814

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155643 T3

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703037 20010405

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS GMBH

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS HOLDING GMBH

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980513

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT