Global patent index - EP 0826463 B1

EP 0826463 B1 2000-07-12 - Tool for screw threaded fasteners

Title (en)

Tool for screw threaded fasteners

Title (de)

Werkzeug für mit Schraubgewinde versehene Befestigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Outil pour fixations taraudées

Publication

EP 0826463 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97306351 A

Priority

GB 9617920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826463A1] A tool (26) is described for a screw threaded fastener that comprises an externally threaded member (11) having an axial bore (23) and radial bores (14) extending through the wall of a threaded portion (13), an internally threaded member having a series of projections (15) extending axially from one radial face, the projections (15) being spaced angularly of one another and a locking pin (21) engaging in one of the radial bores (14) in the externally threaded member (11) and being biased outwardly from the axial bore (23) of the externally threaded member (11) into engagement between a pair of adjacent projections (15) on the internally threaded member (10). The tool (26) comprises a socket member (27) having an annular portion (28) with axially extending formations (29) that co-operate with the axially extending projections (15) on the internally threaded member (10) to transmit torque loads from the socket member (27) to the internally threaded member (10). A radially extending recess (30) is provided in an end face of the annular portion (28) to accommodate the locking pin (21) of the screw fastener and the socket member (26) has a central spigot formation (31) coaxially of the annular portion (28) for engagement in the bore (23) of the internally threaded member (11). The end of the spigot formation (31) is bifurcated and the bifurcation (33) is aligned with the radially extending recess (30) in the end face of the annular portion (28) of the socket member (26). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/50; B25B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/50 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/50 (2013.01); B25B 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826463 A1 19980304; EP 0826463 B1 20000712; DE 69702483 D1 20000817; DE 69702483 T2 20001109; GB 9617920 D0 19961009

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090820

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090820

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070803

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702483

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990105

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980803

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI