Global Patent Index - EP 0826501 B1

EP 0826501 B1 2000-04-26 - Device for adjusting an inking or damping roller in a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for adjusting an inking or damping roller in a printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einstellen einer Farbwerks- bzw. Feuchtwerkswalze einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif utilisé pour ajuster un rouleau d'encrage ou de mouillage dans une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0826501 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810580 A

Priority

EP 96810580 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826501A1] The device is for rollers (3) which are mounted on axles in bearings adjustable by a drive mechanism w.r.t. a machine frame in a plane perpendicular to the axles. The bearings are adjusted along a control surface (10) which interacts with a guide (8). The control surface has an adjustment region essentially parallel to a line (13) bisecting an angle alpha between two lines joining the roller axles to the axles of associated fixed rollers (1,2). Each adjustment drive is a single linear drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 7/40 (2006.01); B41F 31/30 (2006.01); B41F 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/307 (2013.01); B41F 31/308 (2013.01); B41F 31/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826501 A1 19980304; EP 0826501 B1 20000426; EP 0826501 B2 20040102; DE 59605059 D1 20000531; JP 2977197 B2 19991110; JP H1086340 A 19980407; US 5819656 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070903

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060903

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060903

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-09-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060903

2006-02-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-05-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2004-04-13 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2004-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-01-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605059 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990203

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR LI

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR LI

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980814

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR LI

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI