Global patent index - EP 0826502 B1

EP 0826502 B1 2000-05-17 - Method and means for realising a fresh cleaning solution and for treating the used solution

Title (en)

Method and means for realising a fresh cleaning solution and for treating the used solution

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Reinigungslösung und zum Behandeln der verwendeten Reinigungslösung

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de solution d'essuyage fraîche et de traitement de solution d'essuyage usée et dispositif de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0826502 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97810589 A

Priority

CH 215296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826502A1] The method for making a fresh cleaning fluid for a copper-plate printing machine. It involves using softened water, sulphonated ricin oil and caustic soda in proportions of 98.5 per cent, 1 per cent and 0.5 per cent respectively. After the fluid has been used it is subjected to ultrafiltration, producing a clear solution and a concentrated solution. The clear solution is recycled and the concentrated solution is flocculated to give solid residues and a filtered solution, the latter being neutralised, evaporated and distilled. The distilled water is used to make fresh solution, and the contaminated concentrated solution is used to make dry solid salts and a filtrate used for flocculation. The flocculant is made with the addition of calcium chloride and ferrous chloride, and the neutralisation is performed by hydrochloric acid with or without sulphuric acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 9/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826502 A1 19980304; EP 0826502 B1 20000517; AT 192972 T 20000615; AU 1239597 A 19980305; AU 722323 B2 20000727; CA 2193303 A1 19980303; CA 2193303 C 20050412; CN 1116398 C 20030730; CN 1175625 A 19980311; DE 69702032 D1 20000621; DE 69702032 T2 20010118; JP 4035593 B2 20080123; JP H1085789 A 19980407; KR 100433740 B1 20040916; US 5855787 A 19990105

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20141223

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Ref Document Number: 192972

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69702032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192972

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990830

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980728

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI