Global patent index - EP 0826626 B1

EP 0826626 B1 2000-01-19 - Filling head with vent tube adjustable in height

Title (en)

Filling head with vent tube adjustable in height

Title (de)

Füllorgan mit höhenverstellbarem Rückgasrohr

Title (fr)

Tête de remplissage avec tube de retour de gaz réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0826626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112728 A

Priority

DE 19631079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826626A1] The filling member includes a valve body (4) governing the outlet (6) from the supply vessel to the container underneath, and a return gas pipe (12) determining the filling level in the container. The return gas pipe is coupled to a friction brake (38) which blocks its longitudinal movement. The friction brake has a piston (40) guided in a cylinder (41) and moved with the return gas pipe. The piston has, as a friction member, a piston ring (42) which is radially pretensioned against the cylinder wall. The friction brake secures the vertical position of the return gas pipe against the forces acting on the pipe during operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/2642 (2013.01); B67C 3/2614 (2013.01); B67C 3/262 (2013.01); B67C 2003/2668 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631079 A1 19980205; DE 19631079 C2 19980924; EP 0826626 A1 19980304; EP 0826626 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701030

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CROWN SIMPLIMATIC ORTMANN + HERBST MASCHINEN- UND

1998-12-30 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19981022

1998-12-02 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19980101

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980506

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI