Global Patent Index - EP 0826763 A3

EP 0826763 A3 2000-04-26 - Use of 3-acylthioesters as flavouring or perfuming agents

Title (en)

Use of 3-acylthioesters as flavouring or perfuming agents

Title (de)

Verwendung von 3-Acylthiohexylestern als Aroma- und Riechstoffe

Title (fr)

Utilisation de 3-acylthioesters comme agents arômatisants ou parfumants

Publication

EP 0826763 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114062 A

Priority

DE 19634520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826763A2] Flavouring and/or aromatic substances comprising compounds of formula (I) are new. R1, R2 = H, 1-6C alkyl and 5-12C aryl (including furyl and thienyl). Also claimed are (i) flavouring and aromatic substances containing at least one compound (I) and (ii) 3-propionyl thiohexyl propionate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 9/00; A61K 7/46; C07C 327/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 27/29 (2016.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C07C 327/28 (2006.01); C07D 307/68 (2006.01); C07D 333/38 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0011 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2423641 A 19470708 - KNOWLTON ELLINGBOE ELLSWORTH
  • [A] CH 557423 A 19741231 - GIVAUDAN & CIE SA
  • [A] FR 2158401 A1 19730615 - FLAVORS FRANGRA INTERNAL
  • [DY] K-H-ENGEL ET AL: "Identification of new sulfur-containing volatiles in yellow passion fruits (Passilflora edulis f.flavicarpa)", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, vol. 39, no. 12, December 1991 (1991-12-01), pages 2249 - 2252-2252, XP002100629, ISSN: 0021-8561
  • [AD] G.HEUSINGER AND A. MOSANDL: "chirale, schwefelhaltige aromastoffe der gelben passionfrucht", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 25, no. 5, 1984, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM.; NL, pages 507 - 510, XP002131303

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826763 A2 19980304; EP 0826763 A3 20000426; EP 0826763 B1 20021120; DE 19634520 A1 19980305; JP 3711310 B2 20051102; JP H1087604 A 19980407; US 5830846 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708755

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160902

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SYMRISE AG, DE

- Effective date: 20131022

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG#MUEHLENFELDSTRASSE 1#37603 HOLZMINDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG#MUEHLENFELDSTRASSE 1#37603 HOLZMINDEN (DE)

2004-06-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-06-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-06-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-06-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DRAGOCO GERBERDING & CO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-11-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH#POSTFACH 12 53#D-37601 HOLZMINDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG#MUEHLENFELDSTRASSE 1#37603 HOLZMINDEN (DE)

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708755 20030102

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11B 9/00 A, 7A 61K 7/46 B, 7C 07C 327/28 B

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL