Global patent index - EP 0826781 A3

EP 0826781 A3 2000-01-12 - Noncentrifugal sugar composition and a process for the preparation of a sugar product

Title (en)

Noncentrifugal sugar composition and a process for the preparation of a sugar product

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung eines nichtzentrifugierten Zuckers und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zuckerproduktes

Title (fr)

Composition de sucre non-centrifugé et procédé de préparation d'un produit de sucre

Publication

EP 0826781 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97202392 A

Priority

  • JP 21692996 A
  • JP 19072497 A
  • JP 21390897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826781A2] The present invention provides a noncentrifugal sugar composition comprising sugar cane juice and sucrose and/or liquid sucrose, characterized in that the composition has a color value of not more than AI2000, a purity of 93.1 to 86.0 % by weight and a moisture of not more than 2.0 % by weight. The present composition is excellent in stability with the passage of time and has rich flavor. The present invention also provides a process for the preparation of a noncentrifugal sugar composition. The process comprises the following steps: cane juice is filtered; a pH of the juice is adjusted to 5.0-6.0; sucrose or liquid sucrose or both is added to adjust a purity of the mixture to a range of 87.0 to 95.1 % by weight; the mixture is heated and evaporated; and then the mixture is cooled to solidify with a strong shearing force being applied to obtain granules. The present invention also provides a process for the preparation of granule-formed sugar which comprises (1) a step of preparing sugar syrup, (2) a step of heating and evaporating the sugar syrup, (3) a step of crystallizing the sugar syrup to obtain sugar and (4) a step of drying, cooling and conditioning the sugar. In the process, a purity of the sugar syrup obtained from step (1) is adjusted to a range of 87.0 to 95.1 % by weight before step (2); the crystallization of the sugar syrup is carried out with a strong shearing force being applied to obtain granule -formed sugar; and step (4) is carried out in a way where the granule-formed sugar obtained from step (3) is fed and dried in a hopper through the bottom of which dry air is blown in.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13F 1/02; C13F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 30/02 (2011.01); C13B 50/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 30/02 (2013.01); C13B 50/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826781 A2 19980304; EP 0826781 A3 20000112; EP 0826781 B1 20041124; AU 3242397 A 19980205; AU 731295 B2 20010329; DE 69731697 D1 20041230

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-02-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69731697

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20041230

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020927

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI