Global patent index - EP 0826804 B1

EP 0826804 B1 2001-03-28 - Method and device for piecing a yarn in an open-end spinning machine

Title (en)

Method and device for piecing a yarn in an open-end spinning machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anspinnen eines Fadens an einer Offenend-Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour rattacher un fil dans un métier à filer à bout ouvert

Publication

EP 0826804 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112902 A

Priority

DE 19634300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ291436B6] The present invention relates to a process to piece a yarn (2) to an open-end spinning device (1), in which a plurality of handling devices (4) on a service unit (3) traveling alongside a plurality of identical open-end spinning devices (1) execute different work motions and in which a yarn end is taken over by a presentation device (31) and is conveyed to the open-end spinning device (1), and is then returned into same for piecing. In this process, all the handling devices (4) go through a joint motion phase and if necessary through an individual motion phase and in the joint motion phase said handling devices (4) move from a first working position (I) in a second working position (II) that is nearer to the open-end spinning device (1). The handling devices (4) communicating with members (11, 101, 14) of the open-end spinning device (1) work up to joint motion phase. Apparatus for spinning a yarn (2) on an open-end spinning device (1) comprises a service unit (3) traveling alongside a plurality of identical open-end spinning devices (1) and containing a control device (6) for controlling the spinning process and at the same time a plurality of driven handling devices (4) for handling the yarn (2) during spinning. Said handling devices (4) are mounted on a common bearing device (5, 51), which can be moved back and forth between at least two work positions (I, II) by means of a drive arrangement (50, 500) controlled by the control device (6). On the service unit (3) there are performed tools for individual motion of the handling devices (4) and for motion of the common bearing device (5, 51), whereby said handling devices (4), which communicate with the members (11, 101, 14) of the open-end spinning device (1) can work up to the joint motion phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/48 (2006.01); D01H 4/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19634300 A1 19980226; CZ 291436 B6 20030312; CZ 9702586 A3 19980318; EP 0826804 A1 19980304; EP 0826804 B1 20010328; US 5927061 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703224

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981102

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980724

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI