Global Patent Index - EP 0826806 B1

EP 0826806 B1 2002-11-27 - Weft brake particularly for air-jet looms

Title (en)

Weft brake particularly for air-jet looms

Title (de)

Schussfadenbremse insbesondere für Luftdüsenwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Frein de fil de trame plus particulièrement pour métiers à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0826806 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97114831 A

Priority

IT TO960730 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826806A1] A weft brake (10), particularly for air-jet looms, with a diverter (20) for the thread (FT) which moves between two thread guiding bushes (21,22) which are mutually aligned and form a straight path for the thread, wherein the diverter (20) is actuated by a reversible electric motor (26) with the interposition of a bidirectional transmission (28,29) which is advantageously constituted by a screw (29a) which is associated with the shaft (29) of the reversible motor (26) and cooperates with a female thread (28) associated with the diverter (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 59/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826806 A1 19980304; EP 0826806 B1 20021127; DE 69717368 D1 20030109; DE 69717368 T2 20030911; IT 1284778 B1 19980521; IT TO960730 A1 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080828

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717368 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE LI

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI