Global Patent Index - EP 0826819 B1

EP 0826819 B1 2002-11-20 - Apparatus for dewatering a fibre suspension

Title (en)

Apparatus for dewatering a fibre suspension

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entwässern einer Faserstoffsuspension

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déshydratation d'une suspension fibreuse

Publication

EP 0826819 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113282 A

Priority

  • DE 19635217 A
  • DE 19635293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826819A2] The apparatus for the extraction of water from a fibre suspension has an impermeable curved surface with a permeable belt (2) passing round it. The belt (2) and/or the curved surface are moved to give a relative speed between them. The curved surface has recesses, where each can hold a vol. of liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/80; D21F 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826819 A2 19980304; EP 0826819 A3 19990224; EP 0826819 B1 20021120; AT 228183 T 20021215; US 6036029 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-08-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708756 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228183 T 20021215

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER FIBER SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI