Global Patent Index - EP 0826857 B1

EP 0826857 B1 2002-11-20 - Device for controlling a plurality of actuators in a central locking system

Title (en)

Device for controlling a plurality of actuators in a central locking system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Anzahl von Aktuatoren einer Zentralverriegelungsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler une pluralité d'actionneurs dans un système de verrouillage centralisé

Publication

EP 0826857 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111805 A

Priority

DE 19634261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826857A1] The system for controlling a number of actuators arranged in doors or flaps of a central locking system of a motor vehicle. Each of the actuators is assigned at least one adjusting element and at least one signal transmitter. The output signal of the signal transmitter reproduces a position of the adjusting elements which are controlled by the control unit, depending on at least the output signal of a signal transmitter of one of the actuators. A multi-wire connection of at least two leads (51,52 and 71,72) as a two-wire connection is produced, between at least one signal transmitter (5a,7a) and the control unit (9,10,11), for signal transmission. The output signal ''system 0p3n'' is allocated to the signal transmitter, which has the connection with at least two leads as a two-wire connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/48 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826857 A1 19980304; EP 0826857 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170710

2017-08-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170710

2017-07-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708757

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708757 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB PT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB PT

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB PT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980904

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB PT