Global Patent Index - EP 0826925 B1

EP 0826925 B1 2001-12-19 - Process and device for shutting off a burner

Title (en)

Process and device for shutting off a burner

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abschalten eines Brenners

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour arrêter un brûleur

Publication

EP 0826925 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115127 A

Priority

DE 19635576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826925A2] The burner has at least one supply pipe for a mixture of fuel gas and oxygen (3,3',3",3"'). Directly after the interruption of the flow of the fuel gas and oxygen mixture to the burner, an inert or cleansing gas (4,4".4'") is introduced, in the form of nitrogen or a gas mixture containing nitrogen, especially air or pressurised air. The supply pipe for the inert or cleansing gas contains at least one regulating and or cut-off valve (e',e",e'"). The supply pipe(s) for the fuel gas and oxygen mixture and or for the inert or cleansing gas contains check valves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01); F23K 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/007 (2013.01); F23D 14/82 (2013.01); F23D 2209/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826925 A2 19980304; EP 0826925 A3 19990217; EP 0826925 B1 20011219; AT 211240 T 20020115; CZ 291724 B6 20030514; CZ 9702736 A3 19980415; DE 19635576 A1 19980305

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705854

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110413

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-04-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: LINDE AG; DE

- Effective date: 20080227

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705854 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970901

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211240 T 20020115

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

1999-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

1999-10-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970901

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990208

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI PAYMENT 970901

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI PAYMENT 970901