Global Patent Index - EP 0826940 B1

EP 0826940 B1 2002-11-20 - Load distribution process on the moving grate breadth and grate for its application

Title (en)

Load distribution process on the moving grate breadth and grate for its application

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verteilen des Guts über die Breite eines Förder-rosts und Schubrost zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour répartir la charge sur la largeur d'une grille mobile et grille mobile pour son application

Publication

EP 0826940 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114286 A

Priority

DE 19635036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826940A1] The process involves operating an initial section (6) of the conveyor grid at a lower feed speed than that of the neighbouring grid sections (7,8). The transported good is decelerated in parts the slow section of the conveyor grid. Afterwards, at an adjacent balancing section, the conveyor grid is operated at a constant feed speed. The different sections of the conveyor grid are located next to each other along the conveyor length and the width of the slowly moving section is bigger than that of its neighbouring sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 15/02; F23H 7/08; F27B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/31 (2006.01); C04B 7/47 (2006.01); F27B 21/02 (2006.01); F27D 3/06 (2006.01); F27D 15/00 (2006.01); F27D 15/02 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 21/02 (2013.01); F27D 15/0213 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826940 A1 19980304; EP 0826940 B1 20021120; DE 19635036 A1 19980305; DK 0826940 T3 20030317; JP 4028036 B2 20071226; JP H10152218 A 19980609; US 5887703 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-13 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090922

2010-01-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090922

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708759 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLAUDIUS PETERS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

1998-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT SE

1998-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980817

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE