Global Patent Index - EP 0826941 B1

EP 0826941 B1 2001-12-12 - Tubular heat exchange core

Title (en)

Tubular heat exchange core

Title (de)

Rohrblock-Wärmeübertrager

Title (fr)

Bloc d'échange de chaleur tubulaire

Publication

EP 0826941 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113381 A

Priority

DE 19635457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0826941A2] The heat exchanger has a pipe block that comprises a number of pipes (1) which are arranged next to each other with intermediate spacings. The pipes are flat at their end areas and between those ends, rigidly held spacers (5,5a-b) are provided with a connecting channel along each cross side of the pipe block. The pipes are sealed at their ends and have a cross aperture which is connected to cross apertures of the spacers. In the space (2) formed between two adjacent pipes a pair of partition spacers (5a-b) is held and these spacers are not apertured, thus partitioning the connecting channel into two parts and separating the flow so as to form pipe block sections where more than one fluid mediums can flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05366 (2013.01); F28D 1/0325 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0089 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0094 (2013.01); F28F 2280/04 (2013.01); Y10S 165/916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0826941 A2 19980304; EP 0826941 A3 19990616; EP 0826941 B1 20011212; AT 210811 T 20011215; DE 19635457 A1 19980305; US 6196304 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705743

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705743 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210811 T 20011215

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI