Global Patent Index - EP 0827009 B8

EP 0827009 B8 2003-06-25 - Active matrix type liquid crystal display device

Title (en)

Active matrix type liquid crystal display device

Title (de)

Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung mit aktiver Matrix

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide à matrice active

Publication

EP 0827009 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97113910 A

Priority

JP 23166096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827009A2] ÄProblemÜ To provide an active matrix type liquid crystal display device in which the image display is controlled by an electric field parallel to the substrate surface, and which is capable of realizing a wide viewing angle comparable to that of a CRT and a response speed fast enough to display a dynamic image. ÄMeans for Solving the ProblemÜ A liquid crystal display device which comprises a pair of insulating substrate so disposed as to face each other; a pair of orientation films formed over the insulating substrates; a liquid crystal composition held between the pair of orientation films; and pixel electrodes and counter electrodes to apply a lateral electric field almost parallel to surfaces of the substrates; wherein an initial orientation direction on one orientation film side and an initial orientation direction on the other orientation film side are line-symmetric with respect to the direction of the lateral electric field. ÄEffectÜ The liquid crystal display device of lateral electric field type has a fast response speed that allows display of a dynamic image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1343

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/30 (2006.01); C09K 19/02 (2006.01); G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); G02F 1/1337 (2006.01); G02F 1/1343 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/134363 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827009 A2 19980304; EP 0827009 A3 19991222; EP 0827009 B1 20030502; EP 0827009 B8 20030625; CN 1169016 C 20040929; CN 1177746 A 19980401; DE 69721413 D1 20030605; DE 69721413 T2 20040401; JP H1073823 A 19980317; SG 55366 A1 19981221; TW 374855 B 19991121; US 6111625 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160812

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160812

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69721413

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150812

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150804

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., HI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., IPS ALPHA SUPPORT CO., LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., IPS ALPHA SUPPORT CO., LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., HI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP; IPS ALPHA SUPPORT CO., LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP; IPS ALPHA SUPPORT CO., LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-06-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., HI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, CHIBA, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-02-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120119 AND 20120125

2012-02-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120112 AND 20120118

2011-12-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD., HI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., MOBARA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69721413

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-12-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69721413

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69721413 P 20030605

2003-05-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT