Global Patent Index - EP 0827173 A4

EP 0827173 A4 2000-05-17 - CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (en)

CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (de)

LASTSCHALTER

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR

Publication

EP 0827173 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96906042 A

Priority

JP 9600670 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827173A1] A circuit interrupter in which a handle (62) is prevented from being moved to the open position when a movable contact element (44a) and a stationary contact element (43a) are welded together and which has a small-sized handle arm (59). A handle side link (54) of a toggle link mechanism (58) is provided with a cam portion (54a), so that, when the handle (62) is moved toward the open position when the contact elements are welded, the cam portion (54a) engages a bent engaging portion (59a) of the handle arm (59) whereby the handle (62) is prevented from being moved into the open position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/12; H01H 71/50; H01H 73/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/50 (2006.01); H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/501 (2013.01); H01H 71/525 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827173 A1 19980304; EP 0827173 A4 20000517; EP 0827173 B1 20061018; DE 69636639 D1 20061130; DE 69636639 T2 20070823; JP 3814671 B2 20060830; WO 9735333 A1 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080315

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070315

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69636639 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TODA, HARUHISA

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KURATA, KOHEI

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMASAKI, SINSAKU

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-10-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1003282

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 71/50 A

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030324

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 71/12 A, 7H 01H 73/02 B, 7H 01H 71/50 B

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT