Global Patent Index - EP 0827441 B1

EP 0827441 B1 2000-02-02 - BELT GRINDER WITH PIVOTABLE GRINDING UNIT AND OPPOSITE SUPPORTING TABLES AT DIFFERENT WORKING HEIGHTS

Title (en)

BELT GRINDER WITH PIVOTABLE GRINDING UNIT AND OPPOSITE SUPPORTING TABLES AT DIFFERENT WORKING HEIGHTS

Title (de)

BANDSCHLEIFVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHWENKBARER SCHLEIFEINHEIT UND EINANDER GEGENÜBERLIEGENDEN AUFLAGETISCHEN AUF UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN ARBEITSHÖHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF A BANDE DE MEULAGE COMPORTANT UNE UNITE DE MEULAGE PIVOTANTE ET DES PLATEAUX PORTE-PIECES MUTUELLEMENT OPPOSES A DIFFERENTES HAUTEURS DE TRAVAIL

Publication

EP 0827441 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96911899 A

Priority

  • CH 9600181 W
  • CH 150495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9637339A1] The invention relates to a belt grinder of which the supporting tables (13, 14) are arranged in relation to the grinding unit (11) and hence the grinding belt (12) in such a way that tables need not be adjusted at the same time as the grinding unit is pivoted, while nevertheless the gap (z) between the grinding unit and the edges of the tables remains minimal. Such an arrangement is obtained if the value one minus the cosine of half the maximum pivoting angle (y) multiplied by the direct distance (d) between the tables edges is divided by two and the cosine of half the maximum pivoting angle (y) and gives a result acceptable for practical use and compliance with the standards and safety specifications for the gap (z) between the table edges and the grinding unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 21/00; B24B 27/00; B24B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/068 (2013.01); B24B 21/00 (2013.01); B24B 27/0084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9637339 A1 19961128; AT 189421 T 20000215; DE 59604373 D1 20000309; EP 0827441 A1 19980311; EP 0827441 B1 20000202; US 6361421 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604373

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110510

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189421 T

- Effective date: 20110510

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070510

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070510

2006-05-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2002-05-03 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2001-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604373 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189421 T 20000215

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971117

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI