Global Patent Index - EP 0827564 B1

EP 0827564 B1 2003-06-04 - A MODULAR SEIZING DEVICE FOR SLIDING TRACTION, FOR ROLL-UP SHUTTER BELTS

Title (en)

A MODULAR SEIZING DEVICE FOR SLIDING TRACTION, FOR ROLL-UP SHUTTER BELTS

Title (de)

MODULARE GREIFVORRICHTUNG ZUM GLEITEN UND ZIEHEN AN ROLLADENGURTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF MODULAIRE DE SERRAGE PERMETTANT D'EXERCER UNE TRACTION SUR LES COURROIES D'ACTIONNEMENT DE VOLETS ROULANTS

Publication

EP 0827564 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97907266 A

Priority

  • IT 9700052 W
  • IT RM960176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735089A1] The modular seizing device for sliding traction, for roll-up shutter belts consists of two structures (1), that may be composed during installation onto a belt (C) for the traction of a roll-up shutter, so as to realize a knob with anatomic grasping crossed by a groove (2) in which said belt slides, and inside said groove an opening (7) is performed wherein a manual pressure element (5) is housed, provided with tabs (6) for taking hold by friction onto said belt (C), and which has the function of hooking said belt along the handle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2013.01); E06B 2009/785 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735089 A1 19970925; AT 242413 T 20030615; DE 69722536 D1 20030710; EP 0827564 A1 19980311; EP 0827564 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722536 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980324

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR PT