Global Patent Index - EP 0827567 B1

EP 0827567 B1 2000-04-12 - INTAKE MANIFOLD WITH RINGED AIR TUBES FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

INTAKE MANIFOLD WITH RINGED AIR TUBES FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

SAUGROHRANLAGE MIT GERINGELTEN LUFTROHREN FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

COLLECTEUR D'ADMISSION A TUBES D'AIR ANNELES, POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0827567 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96917521 A

Priority

  • FR 9600750 W
  • FR 9506119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9637696A1] Between two half-shells (2, 3) molded and fixed to each other in order to form an envelope (1), there are mounted air tubes (12a) with a ringed external face (14) and a smooth internal face (13) which are fixed by means of end sleeves (17a, 18a) to the envelope (1). The outlet sleeve (18a) is held within a half-shell (3) by means of a fixing clamp (6) to the cylinder-head of the engine by being sealingly connected to an opening (7) of the clamp (6) for the supply of one cylinder by a tubular nozzle comprised of a cradle (29a) integrally cast with the clamp (6) and the half-shell (3), and a cover (31a) fixed to the cradle in order to hold a seal (28) to the extremity of the outlet sleeve (18a), the seal being compressed between the sleeve (18a) and the nozzle (29a, 31a). Application particularly to intake manifolds of internal combustion engines, preferably with controlled ignition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02M 35/10039 (2013.01); F02M 35/10111 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01); F02M 35/10085 (2013.01); F02M 35/10216 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9637696 A1 19961128; DE 69607752 D1 20000518; DE 69607752 T2 20001123; EP 0827567 A1 19980311; EP 0827567 B1 20000412; FR 2734603 A1 19961129; FR 2734603 B1 19970725; US 5964194 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110520

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607752

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607752 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990804

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971124

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE