Global Patent Index - EP 0827704 A3

EP 0827704 A3 2000-01-12 - Seating furniture with synchronised seat and backrest

Title (en)

Seating furniture with synchronised seat and backrest

Title (de)

Sitzmöbelelement o. dgl. mit einer gekoppelten Rückenlehnen- und Sitzverstellung

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise avec siège et dossier synchronisés

Publication

EP 0827704 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97112802 A

Priority

  • DE 19636218 A
  • DE 19639741 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827704A2] The seat (3) is joined to a backrest (2) and a carrying rack (1). The seat can move from a seat position to a couch position via a shifting and lifting movement. A reset spring is provided, and the backrest is connected to the seat via two connection axles (8,9) in the region of the angle vertex at either side. The axles run in two longitudinal hollow slides (10,11), where the first pair (8,10) are arranged at the rear edge of the seat, reaching up to the back rest. The second pair (9,11) are arranged at a distance above the first pair and at the rear edge of the seat. The second pair is located in the middle between a pivoting axis (4) and the first pair, which is located at the same height as a top cushion of the seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/16 (2006.01); A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/0325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827704 A2 19980311; EP 0827704 A3 20000112; EP 0827704 B1 20020508; AT 217161 T 20020515; CA 2213760 A1 19980306; CA 2213760 C 20020115; CN 1131692 C 20031224; CN 1194125 A 19980930; DE 19639741 A1 19980319; DE 19639741 C2 19980709; DE 59707203 D1 20020613; JP 3162325 B2 20010425; JP H10165252 A 19980623; MX 9706723 A 19980628; US 5860701 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100725

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59707203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *JUNGJOHANN THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59707203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 217161

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL