Global Patent Index - EP 0827709 A3

EP 0827709 A3 2000-03-15 - Apparatus for steam-cleaning surfaces

Title (en)

Apparatus for steam-cleaning surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Dampfreinigen von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour nettoyer à la vapeur des surfaces

Publication

EP 0827709 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97201984 A

Priority

IT MI961822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827709A2] Apparatus (1) for steam-cleaning surfaces eliminates troublesome running of condensate in trickles on the surface which has just been cleaned and comprises steam-delivery means (15) associated with a steam source, and a cleaning head (5) which delivers the steam and which has scraping-profile means (12) for wiping condensed steam from a surface and condensate-suction means (22) associated with the scraping-profile means (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 1/08; A47L 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/08 (2006.01); A47L 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4075 (2013.01); A47L 1/08 (2013.01); A47L 11/30 (2013.01); A47L 11/4008 (2013.01); A47L 11/4016 (2013.01); A47L 11/4025 (2013.01); A47L 11/4044 (2013.01); A47L 11/4088 (2013.01); A47L 11/4091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827709 A2 19980311; EP 0827709 A3 20000315; BR 9704212 A 19990112; IT 1284133 B1 19980508; IT MI961822 A1 19980304

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 1/08 A, 7A 47L 11/30 B, 7A 47L 11/34 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI