Global Patent Index - EP 0827767 B1

EP 0827767 B1 2000-11-22 - Apparatus for dewatering sludges and similar substances

Title (en)

Apparatus for dewatering sludges and similar substances

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entwässern von Schlamm und ähnlichen Substanzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déshydratation de boues et substances similaires

Publication

EP 0827767 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114707 A

Priority

  • DE 29614898 U
  • DE 19727762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5961827A] The invention relates an apparatus for the dewatering of sludge and similar substances with a sludge chamber (20) provided with filter areas (25) having at least one sludge inlet being connected to a device (3) creating a hydrostatic filtration pressure. The sludge chamber is formed by pressure plates (22, 23) which can be pressed against each other to create an additional mechanical dewatering pressure by high pressure generators (33). Further there is provided a predewatering stage (2) containing filter areas which is forming a compensation container (5) and which is connected to a continuous sludge feed (6). The device (3) for creating the hydrostatic filtration pressure is formed as one or more syringe-like piston cylinder units (14) of preferably as one or more containers being changeable in volume. These have a sludge inlet connected to the predewatering device (2) and a sludge outlet (17) connected with the sludge chamber (20), wherein at the sludge inlet and at the sludge outlet there are provided closing and control valves (21) which are alternately operable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 29/09; B01D 29/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 25/12 (2006.01); B01D 29/09 (2006.01); B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B01D 36/02 (2006.01); C02F 11/12 (2006.01); B01D 29/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 11/121 (2013.01); B01D 29/096 (2013.01); B01D 29/115 (2013.01); B01D 36/02 (2013.01); B01D 29/6476 (2013.01); B01D 29/6484 (2013.01); B01D 2201/084 (2013.01); B01D 2201/26 (2013.01); B01D 2201/34 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B01D 29/096 + B01D 29/6438 + B01D 29/684 + B01D 29/90 + B01D 29/94
  2. B01D 29/115 + B01D 29/118 + B01D 29/54 + B01D 29/6415 + B01D 29/682 + B01D 29/82 + B01D 29/824 + B01D 29/90

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5961827 A 19991005; AT 197680 T 20001215; AT 221409 T 20020815; EP 0827767 A2 19980311; EP 0827767 A3 19980610; EP 0827767 B1 20001122; JP 2007160309 A 20070628; JP 3957828 B2 20070815; JP 4629061 B2 20110209; JP H1085517 A 19980407

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090826

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DALLA ROSA ADRIANO

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197680 T 20001215

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1999-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980827

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI