Global Patent Index - EP 0827781 B1

EP 0827781 B1 2002-11-06 - Rotary sprayer

Title (en)

Rotary sprayer

Title (de)

Rotationszerstäuber

Title (fr)

Pulvérisateur rotatif

Publication

EP 0827781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115078 A

Priority

DE 19636159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827781A2] A spraying globe with a front side outline edge has a deck motor arranged in a housing, the housing accommodating supply lines for the coating material, cleaning fluid and compressed air as well as at least one high voltage connector. At the globe front side of the motor housing at least one spray nozzle for cleaning fluid is arranged. The nozzle cooperates with a snap ring groove moulded to the motor housing facing the rear side front side of the spraying globe. The cleaning fluid arrives at the globe outer surface through the groove and loosens and removes contamination. The snap ring groove has a radial recess through which the cleaning fluid brought into the groove arrives at the outer globe surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/04; B05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/04 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05B 3/10 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1064 (2013.01); B05B 5/0407 (2013.01); B05B 15/55 (2018.02); B05B 3/1092 (2013.01); B05B 5/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827781 A2 19980311; EP 0827781 A3 19980916; EP 0827781 B1 20021106; DE 19636159 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708656

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABB PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708656 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001208

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI