Global patent index - EP 0827813 A3

EP 0827813 A3 2000-04-12 - Hydraulically actuated mechanism with automatic stroke change

Title (en)

Hydraulically actuated mechanism with automatic stroke change

Title (de)

Fluidbetriebenes Schlagwerk mit automatischer Hubumschaltung

Title (fr)

Dispositif hydraulique à percussion avec inversion automatique de la course du piston

Publication

EP 0827813 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114714 A

Priority

DE 19636659 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827813A2] The hammer mechanism (1) has a striking piston (3) moving alternately through working strokes and return strokes under the influence of a control valve (5). The control unit is itself influenced by a servo valve (14) with a returning device (17, 17a) which can be in locked position or open position, depending on the setting of the striking piston. When the piston limit setting in the direction of the working stroke (3e) is exceeded, the control valve is changed to the return stroke setting. During the return stroke immediately following, a short stroke line (18) pressurises the control valve in advance into the working stroke position so that the piston only makes a short stroke.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/14 (2006.01); E21B 1/26 (2006.01); E21C 37/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827813 A2 19980311; EP 0827813 A3 20000412; EP 0827813 B1 20030319; AT 234707 T 20030415; DE 19636659 A1 19980312; DE 19636659 C2 20001123; ES 2189907 T3 20030716; US 5860481 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189907

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59709545

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PROKOP, HEINZ-JUERGEN, DR.-ING.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEIMER, MARCUS, DR.-ING.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FRITZ, KARLHEINZ

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRUPP BERCO BAUTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI