Global Patent Index - EP 0827829 B1

EP 0827829 B1 2000-04-26 - Image scanning apparatus

Title (en)

Image scanning apparatus

Title (de)

Bildabtastgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de balayage d'image

Publication

EP 0827829 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97306698 A

Priority

GB 9618882 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0827829A1] Image scanning apparatus comprises an elongate image support (1) having a curved cross-section. A scanning system (7-10) is positioned radially inwardly of the support for scanning a radiation beam (11) in a circumferential direction across a record medium (2) on the support. Relative movement is caused between the support and the scanning system parallel with an axis of the support. At least one pair of axially extending resilient baffles (12-16) is mounted on axially opposed sides of the scanning system and extends close to the support to as to impede radiation reflected by a record medium on the support impinging on another part of the record medium. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41B 19/00; B41B 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/06 (2006.01); B41B 19/00 (2006.01); B41B 21/18 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41B 19/00 (2013.01); B41B 21/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0827829 A1 19980311; EP 0827829 B1 20000426; DE 69701784 D1 20000531; DE 69701784 T2 20000817; GB 9618882 D0 19961023; JP H10162127 A 19980619

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2002-09-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701784 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1998-11-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

1998-11-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980828

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI