Global Patent Index - EP 0827830 B1

EP 0827830 B1 2000-07-12 - Cylinder

Title (en)

Cylinder

Title (de)

Zylinder

Title (fr)

Cylindre

Publication

EP 0827830 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114963 A

Priority

DE 19636412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19636412C1] The ends (3,4) of the flexible plate (2) are positioned in a duct (8) into which the outlets (27) open. At least one inlet for pressure piece is connected to the duct on at least one end surface of the cylinder (1). The duct contains an axial pressure piece inlet (26) with a number of outlets. A shaft (17) clamping the ends of the plate contains outlets for the pressure piece. The printing plate is a rubber-coated support plate. The plate is lifted from the outer surface (6) of the cylinder by a pressure piece inserted into the duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/10; B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/10 (2006.01); B41F 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/10 (2013.01); B41F 27/1206 (2013.01); B41P 2227/63 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 29600845 U1 19960307 - ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19636412 C1 19980108; EP 0827830 A1 19980311; EP 0827830 B1 20000712; JP 2996936 B2 20000111; JP H1086335 A 19980407; US 5842419 A 19981201

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701999 20000817

2000-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-11-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980820

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI